Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNelson v. United States Corporation et al
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2017cv02101
Date Filed2017-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer
PlaintiffMoses Nelson
Case DescriptionMoses Nelson submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records pertaining to its Ogden, Utah office. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Nelson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Corporation per 28:3002
DefendantDept of Treasury Internal Revenue Service Director of Disclosure
DefendantSarah Davidson Revenue Officer
DefendantOthers 1 through 100
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-181COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Moses Nelson.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-18Filing fee received from Juaun Bey: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00008762. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-182STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/18/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-193NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Standing Protective Order, 1 Complaint filed by Moses Nelson Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-01-084ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sarah Davidson, Dept of Treasury, United States Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Moses Nelson* *1584 North Avenue* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-085SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. Sarah Davidson served on 1/8/2017, answer due 3/9/2017; Dept of Treasury served on 1/8/2017, answer due 3/9/2017; United States Corporation served on 1/8/2017, answer due 3/9/2017. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-03-086NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Miller on behalf of Sarah Davidson, Dept of Treasury, United States Corporation, Unknown Others (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-087First MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/1/2018 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint 1 Complaint by Sarah Davidson, Dept of Treasury, United States Corporation, Unknown Others. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-098ORDER: The motion for extension of time (Doc. #7) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall either ensure that process is served in accordance with the rules by April 1, 2018, or shall file a memorandum by that date explaining why he does not have to serve process in the manner set forth in defendants' motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/9/2018. (Potter, A.) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-05-019MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Sarah Davidson, Dept of Treasury, United States Corporation, Unknown Others.Responses due by 5/22/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Lauren M. Nash, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0210ORDER: Defendants are requested to promptly file the notice required by D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 12. Plaintiff may file any response to the motion to dismiss by May 16, 2018, and he is advised that his failure to file a timely response by that date will likely lead to the Court's dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this order and the motion to dismiss with attachments (Doc. # 9 ) to plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/2/2018.(Potter, A.) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0211NOTICE by Sarah Davidson, Dept of Treasury, United States Corporation, Unknown Others re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, # 2 Local Civil Rule 7)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-1612MOTION for Extension of Time until two (2) weeks to the 30th of May to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Moses Nelson. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-1813ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Responses due by 5/30/2018. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/18/2018. (Potter, A.) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1814Reset Responses Deadlines due by 5/30/2018 as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff