Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Co. et al v. United States Department of the Interior
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv09883
Date Filed2017-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffJulie Turkewitz
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Julie Turkewitz submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications Secretary Ryan Zinke had regarding national monuments. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Turkewitz to narrow the scope of her request. She did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Turkewitz and the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-181COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Interior. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14488607)Document filed by The New York Times Co., Julie Turkewitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Sims, Charles) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-182FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sims, Charles) Modified on 12/19/2017 (jgo). (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-183REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of the Interior, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Co., Julie Turkewitz. (Sims, Charles) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-184RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Co..(Sims, Charles) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-19***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles S. Sims. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles S. Sims. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The New York Times Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles S. Sims to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): No signature;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-195CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sims, Charles) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (laq) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19Case Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-206ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of the Interior. (laq) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-237NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Almquist Lively on behalf of United States Department of the Interior. (Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-258ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of the Interior.(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-03-189ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference on April 13, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/18/2018) (js) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-0610LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for April 13, 2018 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Lauren Almquist Lively dated April 6, 2018. Document filed by United States Department of the Interior.(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-0911ORDER: granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for April 13, 2018 is adjourned until May 3, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. By April 30, 2018, the parties shall submit a proposed case management plan in accordance with my Individual Rules. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/9/2018) (ap) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-3012JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Lauren Almquist Lively dated April 30, 2018 re: Proposed Stipulation and Scheduling Order. Document filed by United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-0113MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 12 Letter, filed by United States Department of the Interior. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. In light of the parties' stipulation, the initial pre-trial conference scheduled for May 3, 2018 is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/1/2018) (cf) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0114JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between plaintiffs Julie Turkewitz the New York Times Company and defendant DOI, subject to endorsement by the Court, that: DOI may tie the production schedule in this case to that of the production schedule in Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance v. U.S. Department of the Interior, which concerns FOIA requests seeking, among other documents, the same or similar DOI documents sought by plaintiffs such that DOI will process and produce records at the rate specified in that litigation (whether the rate currently specified by the court or subsequent modifications to that rate), while prioritizing the production of records responsive to plaintiffs' request as described herein (as further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/1/2018) (cf) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar