Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al (CIR) v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv07204
Date Filed2017-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR)
PlaintiffBernice Yeung
Case DescriptionThe Center for Investigative Reporting submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning its policies on expedited removal. The agency asked CIR to narrow the scope of its request, which it did. CIR also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-191COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11964026.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/19/2017) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-192Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/19/2017) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-193Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-214Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-215Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-026CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR), Bernice Yeung.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-047CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR), Bernice Yeung (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/4/2018) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-238AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against Department of Homeland Security. Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR), Bernice Yeung. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/23/2018) Modified on 1/24/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-069Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR), Bernice Yeung (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0810ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint; by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 2/8/2018) Modified on 2/9/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-0811CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Homeland Security.. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-03-0512ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0513ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/5/2018) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0614ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-0615NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-0716ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, March 13, 2018, at 4:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-1317CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 3/13/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1418ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/13/2018 by Tamara Lange. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-2019Minute Entry for case management conference held on 3/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 6/19/2018 at 10:00 AM. An updated case management conference statement is due by 6/12/2018. FTR Time: 10:21 - 10:23 Plaintiff Attorney: Victoria Baranetsky Defendant Attorney: Wendy Garbers (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-06-1220JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ; filed by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 6/12/2018) Modified on 6/13/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1321CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Further Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 8/7/2018 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. An updated Case Management Statement is due by 7/31/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff