Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINDIAN LAW RESOURCE CENTER v. OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02708
Date Filed2017-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffINDIAN LAW RESOURCE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Indian Law Resource Center submitted a FOIA request in 2013 to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the Timbisha Shoshone Tribe's leadership dispute. The Indian Law Resource Center also requested a fee waiver. The Office of the Solicitor granted the Resource Center's request for a fee waiver. The Office of the Solicitor also provided some records in three installments. However, the Resource Center was dissatisfied with that response and filed an administrative appeal. After the agency failed to provide any more records, the Indian Law Resource Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-191COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5254892) filed by INDIAN LAW RESOURCE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Exhibit)(Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-222SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/29/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2018.), (Petrovich, Heather) Modified on 1/16/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 12/29/2017 (Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE served on 1/2/2018 (Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS served on 12/29/2017 (Petrovich, Heather) Modified on 1/16/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/02/2018. (Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-188ERRATA by INDIAN LAW RESOURCE CENTER 3 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,. (Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-259NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-2510Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the complaint shall now be due by February 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/29/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/28/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-2811ANSWER to 1 Complaint by OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE.(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified to add link on 3/1/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-01MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/1/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 3/15/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-1512Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report it is ordered that production shall proceed as follows: Defendants will provide an update to Plaintiff regarding their search for responsive documents by April 5, 2018; the parties will file a joint status report by April 12, 2018; Defendants will make an initial production of documents to Plaintiff by April 26, 2018; and the parties will meet and confer regarding the initial production by May 10, 2018. The parties shall file a further joint status report by May 17, 2018, updating the Court on the status of production and, if necessary, proposing a further schedule for production or briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/19/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/12/2018. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 5/10/2018. Further Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF ASSISTANT SECRETARY-INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, PACIFIC REGIONAL OFFICE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-05-1714Joint STATUS REPORT by INDIAN LAW RESOURCE CENTER. (Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 14 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by June 15, 2018 proposing a further schedule for production and, if necessary, briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/22/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-1515Joint STATUS REPORT by INDIAN LAW RESOURCE CENTER. (Petrovich, Heather) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of 15 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by July 16, 2018 updating the Court on the status of the case and proposing a further schedule for production and, if necessary, briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/19/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff