Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVeterans Appellate Law Group, LLC v. United States of America et al
DistrictEastern District of Louisiana
CityNew Orleans
Case Number2:2017cv17550
Date Filed2017-12-19
Date Closed2018-04-19
JudgeJudge Lance M Africk
PlaintiffVeterans Appellate Law Group, LLC
Case DescriptionThe Veterans Appellate Law Group submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs on behalf of two veterans for their claims files. After the agency failed to respond, the Law Group filed administrative appeals. The agency indicated that at least one request would be remanded for processing. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Veterans Appellate Law Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6554262) filed by Veterans Appellate Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit B-1, # 8 Exhibit B-2, # 9 Exhibit B-3, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit C-1, # 12 Exhibit C-2, # 13 Exhibit C-3, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons)Attorney Matthew G. Greig added to party Veterans Appellate Law Group, LLC(pty:pla).(Greig, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2017) (blg). (Attachment 14 replaced on 12/27/2017) (blg). (Attachment 15 replaced on 12/27/2017) (blg). (Attachment 16 replaced on 12/27/2017) (blg). Modified on 12/27/2017 (blg). (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-193Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint,; Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet and summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (blg) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-272Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (djg) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-274Summons Issued as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2, # 2 Summons 3)(blg) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-02-015EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party United States Department of Veterans Affairs(pty:dft), Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Dupre, Brock) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-016ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America answer due 2/23/2018. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/2018. (blg) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-237ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America.(Dupre, Brock) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-238NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2018 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-159SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 09:45 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 6/29/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Bench Trial set for 9/10/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge) (blg) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-2210ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 09:45 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/22/2018.(blg) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-1111Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 4/11/2018. ORDERED: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/18/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (blg) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1812Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/18/2018. ORDERED that defense counsel notify the Court regarding the status of settlement discussions no later than 4/19/2018 at 12:00 P.M. (blg) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-1913ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/19/2018.(blg) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-1914This Court has been advised that the case has settled. Counsel are thanked for their assistance. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/19/2018.(blg) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff