Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleConley v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2017cv04714
Date Filed2017-12-20
Date Closed2018-03-05
JudgeJudge Douglas L Rayes
PlaintiffWilliam Henry Conley, III
Case DescriptionWilliam Conley submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning an incident that occurred at the Denver airport. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and Conley was told that the FOIA analyst had located responsive records. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Conley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-201COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14983223 filed by William Henry Conley, III. (Submitted by Matthew Goldstein) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LAD) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-202SUMMONS Submitted by William Henry Conley, III. (Submitted by Matthew Goldstein) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (LAD) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-203Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14983223. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-04714-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (LAD) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-204Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (3 total) (LAD) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-215SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty (30) days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is six (6) months from the date the case is filed. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/21/2017. (MMO) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-226NOTICE re: Service by William Henry Conley, III re: 5 Scheduling Order . (Goldstein, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-197SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Henry Conley, III: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Notice of Availability and Consent to Exercise of Magistrate Judge Form upon U.S. Attorney General, U.S Attorney's Office, Department of Homeland Security on 12/27/17, 01/02/18, 01/19/18. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Goldstein, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-02-028ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security.(Schoch, Coleen) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-289* Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by William Henry Conley, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Matthew). * Added MOTION to Retain Jurisdiction to Determine Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs on 3/1/2018 (LAD). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-0510ORDER: Plaintiff's FOIA claim against Defendant in this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. ORDERED that the Court retains jurisdiction over the this action solely for the purpose of determining Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and entering any order related thereto. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer concerning payment of Plaintiff's attorney's fees and costs on or before March 22, 2018. If they are unable to reach an agreement concerning payment, the parties shall promptly ask the Court to set a briefing and hearing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/2/18. (EJA) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff