Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02712
Date Filed2017-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning the existence of a fund to pay settlements in cases of misconduct by members of Congress. Cause of Action Institute also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and later told COA that its request had been sent to the Bureau of Fiscal Services for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-201COMPLAINT against TREASURY DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5256363), CIVIL COVER SHEET by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of acknowledgement, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Steven, Lee) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/10/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsth) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) Modified parties served on 1/3/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-273STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/27/2017. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-024REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-035Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/4/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-036NOTICE of Appearance by John E. McGlothlin, II on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (McGlothlin, John) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-037SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (znmw) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 1/16/2018 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/16/2018. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-1810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/17/2018. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-2611NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-1612Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16MINUTE ORDER granting the Defendant's 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by March 20, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/16/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer to the complaint due by 3/20/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-03-2013ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Whitaker, Claire) Modified to add link on 3/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before April 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/20/2018. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report by 4/10/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-1014Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steven, Lee) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 11, 2018, updating the Court on the status of their discussions and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/11/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/11/2018. (tg) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-1115STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 15 Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before June 15, 2018, updating the Court on the status of their discussions and proposing a schedule for any further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/11/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-1516Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by July 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/15/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 7/31/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff