Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePinnicchia v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2017cv02139
Date Filed2017-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Victor A. Bolden
PlaintiffJohn Pinnicchia
Case DescriptionJohn Pinnicchia submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs concerning a VA police report pertaining to an investigation in which Pinnicchia was accused of employment-related improprieties, but was exonerated. The agency disclosed the report, but redacted everything but Pinnicchia's name. Pinnicchia filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld the denial of the records. Pinnicchia then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4656118.), filed by John Pinnicchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, John) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-212NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of John Pinnicchia (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-214ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/21/2017.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-215STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/21/2017.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-223Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/21/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2018; Discovery due by 6/23/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2018. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2017.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-226NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 5 Protective Order, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John Pinnicchia, 1 Complaint filed by John Pinnicchia Signed by Clerk on 12/22/2017.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-227ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-038SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Pinnicchia. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 12/29/2017, answer due 1/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Marshal Return, # 2 Marshal Return, # 3 Marshal Return, # 4 Return of Service)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-269SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Pinnicchia. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Return of Service, # 2 Supplement Return of Service)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-2910NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Larson on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs (Larson, John) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-2911ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.(Larson, John) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-07-1312MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Responses due by 8/3/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Larson, John) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1313Statement of Material Facts re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Quinn D. Martin, # 2 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment, # 4 Exhibit C - IAD, # 5 Exhibit D - Record as Produced, # 6 Exhibit E - FAD, # 7 Exhibit F - Unredacted Record (subject to motion to seal))(Larson, John) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1314Sealed Document: Exhibit F to Martin Declaration by United States Department of Veterans Affairs re 13 Statement of Material Facts, . (Larson, John) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1315MOTION to Seal Exhibit F to Martin Declaration by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1516ORDER granting 15 Motion to Seal. The Court finds that good cause exists to seal these documents and that sealing is supported by clear and compelling reasons and is narrowly tailored to serve those reasons. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 5(e). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/15/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 07/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff