Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02737
Date Filed2017-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning its new Gravestone cyber and electronic surveillance system. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-211COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5258784) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (md) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-294ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Haynes, Fred) Modified to add link on 1/30/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/30/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 2/13/2018. (kh) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-135Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Proposed Joint Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown and nunc pro tunc to February 13, 2018, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED, and that the parties' time to file their joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure is extended to February 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/14/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-276Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Proposed Schedule for Briefing or Disclosure by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-017Joint STATUS REPORT Proposed Schedule for Disclosure by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown and nunc pro tunc to February 27, 2018, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED, and that the parties' 7 Joint Status Report is deemed timely filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED, in light of the parties 7 Joint Status Report, that the parties shall file a further status report by May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/2/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-05-188Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/21/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-07-209STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant's 9 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by September 24, 2018. The Court expects future status reports to be filed on behalf of both parties, unless they are unable to reach agreement on the content of the report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-09-2410Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/24/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-11-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule by December 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/16/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-0612PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE For Summary Judgment Motions by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Proposed Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by March 6, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by April 8, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by April 22, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by May 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/7/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-0713Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It appears that Defendant filed its motion for an extension of time to file a renewed motion for summary judgment in the wrong case. Defendant has not yet filed a summary judgment motion in this action, and its initial motion for summary judgment is not due until March 6, 2019. Further, the caption included on Defendant's motion refers to Civil Action No. 17-1728, which is proceeding before Judge Sullivan, rather than the instant action, Civil Action No. 17-2737. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/10/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-03-0614Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by April 5, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by May 8, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by May 22, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by June 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/7/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-2815Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 15 Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 6, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by June 10, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by June 24, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-05-0616Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-07MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 20, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by June 24, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by July 8, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/7/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-2017Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 17 Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendants motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 23, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by June 27, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by July 11, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by July 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/21/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2318Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-24MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 18 Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by June 3, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by July 8, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by July 22, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/24/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-06-0319Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-04MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by June 5, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by July 10, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by July 24, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by August 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/4/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-0520Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Final) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by June 7, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by July 12, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by July 26, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/6/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-0721MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit to Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-07-1222Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-12MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 22 Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by July 15, 2019; (2) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by July 29, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by August 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/12/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1223NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1524Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Supplement Table of FBI Offices and Systems, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1525Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Supplement Table of FBI Offices and Systems, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-2526Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by August 19, 2019; and (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by September 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/25/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-08-1627Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-16MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 27 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by August 26, 2019; and (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/16/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-2328Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-26MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendant shall file its consolidated opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by August 30, 2019; and (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by September 16, 2019. The Court will not grant Defendant any further extensions in this matter absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-3029REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit L)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-08-3030Memorandum in opposition to re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-1031NOTICE of Amended Response to Statement of Material Facts by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 30 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts (Amended))(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar