Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02754
Date Filed2017-12-21
Date Closed2018-06-13
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a Sept. 21, 2017 conference that was referred to in a Washington Post article. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and put the request in its complex queue. WildEarth Guardians submitted a second FOIA request to the Bureau for records concerning a proposal to limit to five the number of FOIA requests a requester could file with the BLM in a single day. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request and also put it in its complex queue for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency as to either of its requests, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-211COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5259966) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Civil Process Clerk Summons, # 3 Summons BLM Summons, # 4 Summons Attorney General Summons)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (jd) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-194NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-02-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service on Civil Process Clerk of the U.S. Attorney's Office)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-206ANSWER to 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Walker, Johnny) Modified to add link on 2/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-20MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/20/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/6/2018. (kh) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-217NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Nokes on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Nokes, Kelly) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/22/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-068Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/6/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-05-149Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/15/2018. (lctjk1) Modified on 5/17/2018 (kh). (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-1310STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff