Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNEVADANS FOR BACKGROUND CHECKS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02764
Date Filed2017-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffNEVADANS FOR BACKGROUND CHECKS a Nevada not-for-profit organization
Case DescriptionNevadans for Background Checks submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the FBI and the General Services Administration pertaining to conducting background checks pursuant to Nevada's recently passed background check initiative. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Nevadans for Background Checks filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-221COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5262216) filed by NEVADANS FOR BACKGROUND CHECKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-222Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEVADANS FOR BACKGROUND CHECKS. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-22Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-023SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-02SUMMONS Not Issued as to United States Attorney General and United States Attorney for the District of Columbia. (jd) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-024REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE United States Attorney General and United States Attorney, District of Columbia filed by NEVADANS FOR BACKGROUND CHECKS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-035SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-036GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/3/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/4/2018. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/4/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/3/2018. (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-179RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 1/5/2018 (Stouck, Jerry) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-02-0510NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0511ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiff's), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Defendant's))(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-05-1413ORDER requiring Defendant to making rolling productions of responsive material beginning on 5/21/2018 and every 30 days thereafter, and to file a status report on 5/28/2018, and every 30 days thereafter. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/14/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-2914STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-2515STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 7/25/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/26/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff