Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRamaci v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv10084
Date Filed2017-12-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronnie Abrams
PlaintiffLisa Ramaci
Case DescriptionLisa Ramaci, a plaintiff in several lawsuits alleging that Iran was responsible for the kidnapping and murder of her husband journalist Stephen Vincent in Basra, Iraq in 2005, whose death was investigated by the FBI, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for its records pertaining to its investigation of Vincent's murder. Because the file contained more than 3,300 pages, Ramaci eventually narrowed her request to two documents, a closing memo and a description of the investigation totaling 116 pages. The agency agreed to disclose the records, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ramaci filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-261COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14514218)Document filed by Lisa Ramaci.(Friedman, William) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-262CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-263FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Ramaci. (Friedman, William) Modified on 12/27/2017 (jgo). (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-264FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. Document filed by Lisa Ramaci. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Friedman, William) Modified on 12/27/2017 (jgo). (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-27***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Adam Friedman regarding Document No. 4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket #1 has been accepted as the Initial Pleading moving forward. If you wish to file the exhibits with the complaint, you could either file an Amended Complaint or file a Corrected Complaint with permission from the Judge assigned to your case. (jgo) Modified on 12/27/2017 (jgo). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William Adam Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-275AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Federal Bureau Of Investigation.Document filed by Lisa Ramaci. Related document: 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Friedman, William) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-276REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lisa Ramaci. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-287ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (pc) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-128ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/12/2018) (ap) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-169NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-1610AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Conference dated January 12, 2018 (ECF No. 8) served on Federal Bureau of Investigation on January 16, 2018. Document filed by Lisa Ramaci. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-1611NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jacob Radine on behalf of Lisa Ramaci. (Radine, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-0112ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-2313JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 2/23/2018 re: pursuant to Court's 1/12/2018 Order. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/1/2018. (arc) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0114ORDER. The parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court no later than March 30, 2018, updating the Court on the status of the case and, if possible, proposing a time line for the production of any additional documents. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/1/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-3015JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Natasha Teleanu and William Friedman dated 3/30/2018 re: status updates and proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0316MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 Letter regarding status updates and proposed briefing schedule filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The parties shall submit their status report no later than May 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/3/2018) (rj) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-0417JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from William Friedman and Natasha Teleanu dated May 4, 2018 re: Status Report. Document filed by Lisa Ramaci.(Friedman, William) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0718ORDER: Although the Court is sympathetic to Plaintiff's desire to obtain the relevant documents to which she claims she is entitled as quickly as possible, summary-judgment briefing is premature at this time. There are still thousands of pages of documents that the FBI has agreed to review and process between now and December 2018. Although Plaintiff describes the issue with regard to the (b)(7)(D) redactions as "discrete," it appears likely that related but distinct issues will continue to arise throughout the course of the remaining production. At present, it would be inefficient for both the parties and the Court to address Plaintiff's objection. When the Court has a more complete record, it will be better positioned to assess the parties' arguments. The Court thus denies Plaintiff's request for a summary-judgment briefing schedule without prejudice. As the record develops and documents are produced, Plaintiff may renew her request if she believes it appropriate to do so. If Plaintiff chooses to renew her request prior to the end of the scheduled productions, she should indicate in her request why she believes the issues on which she seeks partial summary judgment are not likely to be implicated by the documents that have not yet been produced, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/7/2018) (ras) Modified on 5/7/2018 (ras). (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-07-2719NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Krause on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar