Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAMB v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02783
Date Filed2017-12-27
Date Closed2018-01-23
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJAMES P. LAMB
Case DescriptionJames Lamb submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Trade Commission for records concerning himself, the organizations DOT Authority.com, Interstateauthority.com, and Logistec/TTS. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but denied them in full under five exemptions. Lamb filed administrative appeals for the denials. The agency upheld its original denial and added that his unpaid fees had exceeded the $250 aggregate amount. Lamb then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-271COMPLAINT JAMES P. LAMB against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5265294) filed by JAMES P LAMB. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1 - 14, # 3 Summons SUMMONS FTC, # 4 Summons SUMMONS USAG, # 5 Summons SUMMONS USDADC)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-272First MOTION for Vaughn Index by JAMES P LAMB (Bopp, James) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-273NOTICE OF PROPOSED ORDER re 2 MOTION for Vaughn Index by JAMES P LAMB (Bopp, James) Modified event title on 1/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (jd) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-284Amended MOTION for Vaughn Index by JAMES P. LAMB (Bopp, James) Modified event title on 1/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-025ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) Modified on 1/17/2018 (jd). (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-106NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-17NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA. The improper summonses were submitted and issued. Counsel is instructed to file the correct summonses for FOIA cases.(jd) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-227REQUEST for Summons to Issue Summons to Federal Trade Commission by JAMES P. LAMB (Bopp, James) Modified event title on 1/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-228REQUEST for Summons to Issue Corrected FOIA Summons by JAMES P. LAMB (Bopp, James) Modified event title on 1/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-229REQUEST for Summons to Issue Corrected FOIA Summons by JAMES P. LAMB (Bopp, James) Modified event title on 1/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-2310NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JAMES P. LAMB (Bopp, James) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff