Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSanchez-Lebron et al v. National Personnel Records Center et al
DistrictDistrict of Puerto Rico
CitySan Juan
Case Number3:2017cv02379
Date Filed2017-12-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carmen C. Cerezo
PlaintiffMiriam Sanchez-Lebron
PlaintiffCarlos Manuel Sanchez-Lebron
Case DescriptionMiriam Sanchez-Lebron submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning her grandfather Eladio Lebron. She received some records, but after the agency failed to respond further, she filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Personnel Records Center
DefendantDefense Finance and Accounting Service
DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-271COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number PRX100053205.) filed by Miriam Sanchez-Lebron, Carlos Manuel Sanchez-Lebron, pro se. Service due by 3/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Civil Cover Sheet, # 30 Category Sheet, # 31 Receipt) (idg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2017: # 32 Exhibit) (idg). Modified to add receipt number on 1/2/2018 (idg). (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2017-12-272Summons Issued as to Defense Finance and Accounting Service, Department of Veterans Affairs, National Personnel Records Center. (idg) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-01-043MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Miriam Sanchez-Lebron, pro se. Responses due by 1/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-044**SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel filed by Miriam Sanchez-Lebron, pro se. (idg) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-165SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Sanchez-Lebron, pro se upon Defense Finance and Accounting Service served on 1/2/2018, answer due 01/23/2018. (idg) Modified to edit service and answer due date on 1/17/2018 (idg). (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-166SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Sanchez-Lebron upon Department of Veterans Affairs served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018. (idg) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-167CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE PLEADING. Service Date/Date of Delivery are not provided as Proof of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (idg) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-06-128ORDER denied 3 pro se Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall retain counsel by 7/12/2018 . Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/8/2018. (mld) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-059NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Gabriel Garcia-Miranda on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Garcia-Miranda, Carlos) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff