Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBARTELHO v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02627
Date Filed2017-12-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffTHOMAS J. BARTELHO
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (BOP)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-08Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/8/2017. (md) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2017-12-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by THOMAS J. BARTELHO. (md) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2017-12-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by THOMAS J. BARTELHO (md) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-053ORDER the plaintiff to provide the Court with a certified copy of his trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) including the supporting ledger sheets, for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint, obtained from the appropriate official of each prison at which plaintiff is or was confined. ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of this Order, the plaintiff shall provide the information described above. Failure to comply with Order will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/5/2018. (zsth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff