Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00007
Date Filed2018-01-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the decision to invite reporters to the agency on December 12, 2017 to share with them private text messages sent during the 2016 presidential campaign by two former FBI investigators on Special Counsel Robert Mueller's team. CREW also requested expedited processing. In partial response to its request, DOJ's Office of Inspector General provided CREW a December 15 letter indicating that DOJ had not consulted OIG as to whether disclosure would raise ethical problems. The Office of Information Policy acknowledged receipt of CREW's request and told CREW that its request was still pending. After hearing nothing further from any component of the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5270667) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney Generl, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-03Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-164AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON.(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-085NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita Balakrishnan Andrapalliyal on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-086ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 3/5/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/9/18. (DJS) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2018. (tb) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-057Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file their report by 3/6/18. The parties are hereby reminded that all motions must be accompanied by a proposed order. See Local Civil Rule 7(c). Additionally, all joint status reports shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/6/18. (DJS) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-068Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/6/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-04-02MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set for 4/11/18 at 10:45 am in Courtroom 9. The parties shall file a joint updated status report and proposed order by noon on April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/2/18. (DJS) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by noon on 4/9/2018. Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (jl) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-039NOTICE of Appearance by Conor M. Shaw on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Shaw, Conor) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-0310NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Rappaport on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Rappaport, Adam) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-0911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-10Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 4/11/2018 at (TIME CHANGE) 11:15 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-11Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 4/11/2018 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: OIP shall produce documents by not later than 04/30/18 and production should be completed by 06/30/18. Joint Status Report due by 5/16/2018. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-05-1612Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-24MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 12 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/24/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-2913MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Responsive, Non-exempt Records Subject to FOIA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORD: Granting 13 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant's time to complete production is extended to July 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/2/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's time to complete production is extended to 7/5/2018. (jth) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-0914Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-17MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 13 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendant will file its motion for summary by August 13, 2018. Plaintiff will file its opposition to Defendants' motion and combined cross-motion for summary judgment by September 13, 2018. Defendant will file its combined reply/opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by October 4, 2018,. Plaintiff will file its reply in support of its cross-motion by October 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/17/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 9/13/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/4/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/18/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 8/13/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/13/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/4/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-1015MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1016Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1317REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-14MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set for 8/20/18 at 10:15 am in Courtroom 9. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/14/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-15Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/20/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-20Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 8/20/2018 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: The government shall file a status report by 8/24/2018. Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/29/2018. Status Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) Modified on 8/21/2018 (tb). (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-2418STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-2919MOTION for Leave to File an Individual Status Report by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Shaw, Conor) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: # 2 Exhibit status report) (ztd). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-2920ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Shaw, Conor) Modified on 8/30/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-2921PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-30NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 20 Status Report, was entered in error and said pleading has been added as an exhibit to docket entry no. 19 , pending leave of court. (ztd) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-3022TRANSCRIPT OF 8/20/18 STATUS HEARING, before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, held on August 20, 2018. Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance: August 30, 2018. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days , the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2018.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-1723NOTICE of Appearance by Nikhel Sus on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/20/2018) (ztd). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-04ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/2018. (lctsc2). (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-04ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Individual Status Report. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/2018. (lctsc2). (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-0424STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (ztd) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-05MINUTE ORDER: The Office of Information Policy is hereby ordered to complete its production by Friday, October 12, 2018. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on October 26, 2018. Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion is due on November 16, 2018. Defendant's opposition and reply is due on December 7, 2018. Plaintiff's reply is due on December 21, 2018. SO ORDERED - by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/05/18. (tb) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-05Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 10/5/2018 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: See Minute Order filed 10/05/18. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (tb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-2625MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Deborah M. Waller, # 4 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-1326NOTICE of Change of Address by Nikhel Sus (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar