Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLove v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of Indiana
CityHammond
Case Number2:2018cv00011
Date Filed2018-01-05
Date Closed2018-04-23
JudgeJudge Philip P Simon
PlaintiffBryant Love
Case DescriptionBryant Love submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his investigative file. Love also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied his request for expedited processing. Love filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information and Policy. OIP upheld it original decision on appeal. Love then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-051PRO SE COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief (under the Freedom of Information Act) with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Bryant Love. No filing fee or IFP submitted (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope)(jss) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-052This case is related to Criminal Matter 2:17-CR-2. (jss) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-163ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this case to Judge Simon. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 1/16/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-16Judge Philip P Simon added. Judge Rudy Lozano no longer assigned to case. (jss) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-224ORDER: The clerk is DIRECTED to place this cause number on a blank in forma pauperis petition and send it to Bryant Love; Bryant Love is GRANTED until 02/16/2018, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis petition accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months; and Bryant Love is CAUTIONED that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 01/22/2018. (Copy mailed as directed in the order)(sct) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-055**Incorrect Document Attached** PRISONER MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 2 copies of summons forms and 2 copies of USM-285 forms (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Bryant Love. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 USM 285 Forms, # 3 Envelope, # 4 Prisoner Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis). (nal) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-056AFFIDAVIT re 5 PRISONER MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryant Love. (nal) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-137ORDER: The Court GRANTS plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis 5 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Bryant Love, BOP# 09049-027, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) $350.00 to the clerk of this court in payment of the initial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk of this court 2% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is houses until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 2/13/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party; MCC Chicago, cc: Financial)(jss) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-04-238OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DISMISSES this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A because it is malicious. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 4/23/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-249CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (copy mailed to pro se party) (jss) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff