Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00042
Date Filed2018-01-08
Date Closed2018-07-13
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning credit card charges submitted for travel by EPA and Department of Interior from April 2017 through September 2017. The agency denied the request, telling EIP that it was not allowed to disclose credit card charge information pertaining to other agencies. EIP filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-081COMPLAINT against GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5278086) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons USAO, # 8 Summons GSA, # 9 Summons US Attorney General)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/9/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-082Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-08Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-093SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) Modified on 1/10/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-094NOTICE Corrected GSA Summons by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-095GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/9/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-106SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 1/12/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-3110NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-1511ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-22MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 3/8/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/22/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-0812PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint) by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-12MINUTE ORDER adopting parties' Joint Proposed Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the following deadlines are set in this matter: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 4/26/2018; Plaintiffs' consolidated Opposition and Cross Moion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 5/17/2018; Defendant's consolidated Reply and Cross-Motion Opposition is due on or before 6/7/2018; Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion Reply is due on or before 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/12/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-04-2413First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-2514RESPONSE re 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Opposition) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-02MINUTE ORDER granting fro good cause shown, 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this matter is amended as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 5/3/2018; Plaintiffs' consolidated Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 5/24/2018; Defendant's consolidated Reply and Cross-Motion Opposition is due on or before 6/14/2018; and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion Reply is due on or before 6/28/2018. While no further extensions of the deadline for Defendant to file its motion for summary judgment will be granted, this Court will entertain a motion from Plaintiff to extend the remaining schedule to accommodate other deadlines and obligations. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/02/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0315MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Defendant's Statement of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute, # 3 Declaration of Travis Lewis, # 4 Exhibits A-F to Lewis Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-2416Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Facts and Response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Declaration of Sylvia Lam, # 4 Exhibit A to F, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Eric) . (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2417Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (See Docket Entry 16 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-25NOTICE OF ERROR re 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; emailed to eschaeffer@environmentalintegrity.org, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. When you have a document that has multiple events, you must file all parts. Please file an entry for your Opposition. (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-0818Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this matter is modified as follows: Defendant's consolidated Reply and Cross-Motion Opposition is due on or before 7/16/2018; and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion Reply is due on or before 7/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/11/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-1219Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER. Where only attorneys' fees remain at issue in a FOIA case, it is the practice of this Court to close the case administratively while it awaits notice from the parties regarding settlement of the attorneys' fee or or a joint proposed schedule for briefing this remaining dispute. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED and the 19 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 8/31/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for briefing the issue of attorneys' fees, if such briefing is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/13/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-3120Joint STATUS REPORT by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 9/14/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for briefing the issue of attorneys' fees, if such briefing is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/06/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar