Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00043
Date Filed2018-01-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning communications between the now terminated Presidential Advisory Committee on Election Integrity and DHS concerning the transfer of personal data. EPIC requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency told EPIC its request was too broad. In response, EPIC narrowed the scope of its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5278234) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-08Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (sth) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Counsel/Party)(sth) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-243RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2018. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/16/2018. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/16/2018 (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-156NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-157ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-168NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-289NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-0510NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/3/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/20/2018. (kh) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-2011Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 11 Joint Status Report filed by the parties and the representations therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by June 15, 2018, that informs the Court whether any outstanding issues remain and, if appropriate, proposes a schedule for briefing and submission of a Vaughn index. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/23/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (kh) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-06-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the 12 Joint Status Report filed by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/18/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the 13 Joint Status Report filed by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal or another joint status report by July 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/29/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Stipulation of dismissal and/or joint status report due by 7/30/2018. (jl) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff