Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv00175
Date Filed2018-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Analisa Torres
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning administrator Scott Pruitt's "State Action Tour." NRDC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted NRDC's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-091COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14555342)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A August 3, 2017 FOIA Request)(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-093REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-094RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-095MOTION for Ian Paul Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14556215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit)(Fisher, Ian) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-10>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 5 MOTION for Ian Paul Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14556215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-106ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-107INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/10/2018) (mro) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-178ORDER granting 5 Motion for Ian Paul Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (DN) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-229NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Byars, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-2910LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated January 29, 2018. Document filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-3011ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 7, 2018 is ADJOURNED to February 21, 2018, at 11:20 a.m. By February 14, 2018, the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed schedule for production and briefing. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2018 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/30/2018) (cf) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-0112AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 1/10/2018, answer due 2/9/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EPA Service, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Attorney General Service, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - US Attorney Civil Process Clerk Service)(Fisher, Ian) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-1213ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff