Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCLARK v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00075
Date Filed2018-01-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffGEORGE E. CLARK
Case DescriptionGeorge Clark, a research librarian at Harvard University, submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for emails between EPA Chief of Staff Ryan Jackson and 20 named individuals. Clark requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request and denied his requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency asked Clark to narrow the scope of his request. Clark declined to do so. The agency denied Clark's request because it failed to sufficiently describe the records sought. Clark filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Clark filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-121COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5285046) filed by GEORGE E. CLARK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Agency, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/16/2018) (jd). (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-12Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/18/2018. (Llewellyn, Patrick) Modified dates on 1/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-164GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/16/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-165Case randomly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/18/2018, (znmw) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-266NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-157ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-22MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report no later than March 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 22, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-238Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGE E. CLARK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it hereby is ORDERED that the EPA shall complete a search for responsive records as soon as possible but no later than April 20, 2018. Following completion of the search, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report that addresses the number of responsive records and a proposed schedule for production. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 3, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-249Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGE E. CLARK. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER approving the proposed schedule set forth in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that EPA shall process 500 documents and make an initial production of non-exempt documents by June 5, 2018. EPA shall continue to produce documents by the 5th of each month, unless the 5th day falls on a weekend or holiday, in which case the production shall occur on the next business day. The parties shall confer and submit a joint status report by June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 24, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-06-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGE E. CLARK. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall proceed in compliance with the Minute Order issued on April 24, 2018. In addition, the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 16, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 06/16/2018)
2018-07-1211Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff