Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrown v. Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2018cv00073
Date Filed2018-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard D. Bennett
PlaintiffLewis Harrison Brown, Jr.
Case DescriptionLewis Brown was arrested and convicted of possession of drugs in Maryland. He later asked the court to expunge his conviction, which it did. However, he then found out that his fingerprints and conviction information were in a federal crime database. He filed suit against the Department of Justice to force the agency to expunge the records. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7088889.), filed by Lewis Harrison Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1-6 inclusive)(Kline, Robert) Modified on 1/10/2018 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-102QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint - Exhibits filed by Lewis Harrison Brown, Jr. were filed incorrectly. Each exhibit should be attached separately to the main document. Your documents have been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-103QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint filed by Lewis Harrison Brown, Jr. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link to 1 Complaint. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-104NOTICE by Lewis Harrison Brown, Jr re 1 Complaint, filing Summons for Defendants (curing deficiency) (Attachments: # 1 summons - US DC MD, # 2 summons - US AG)(Kline, Robert) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-105Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Justice and U.S. Attorney (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff