Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv00369
Date Filed2018-01-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning the preparation of the President's Daily Brief since the beginning of the Trump Administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-161COMPLAINT against Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14576254)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-163RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-164REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-175ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (jgo) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-226NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/22/2018) (tn) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-087NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-128LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Samuel Dolinger dated 2/12/2018 re: Parties' joint letter in advance of initial pre-trial conference. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-129MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 8 Letter filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The initial conference in this matter is rescheduled to Thursday, March 29, 2018, at 3:15 PM. The parties are excused from filing a proposed case management plan. Instead, the parties are directed to file a joint letter by Monday, March 26, 2018 outlining how the parties propose to proceed. SO ORDERED.(Initial Conference set for 3/29/2018 at 03:15 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/12/2018) (anc) Modified on 2/14/2018 (anc). (Entered: 02/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff