Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCurran v. United States Postal Service
DistrictEastern District of Wisconsin
CityMilwaukee
Case Number2:2018cv00088
Date Filed2018-01-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge William E Duffin
PlaintiffKenneth P Curran
Case DescriptionKenneth Curran, an employee of the U.S. Postal Service, submitted a FOIA request to agency for concerning the unauthorized use of computers by employees at the Madison, Wisconsin post office. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Curran's request under Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Curran filed an administrative appeal of that denial. The agency upheld the denial on the basis of Exemption 6. Curran then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Postal Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-171COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service by Kenneth P. Curran. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2750971) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint to OIG, # 2 Exhibit E-mail message from Congressman Pocan's office, # 3 Exhibit OIG Audit Report, # 4 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit Response to FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit Appeal letter, # 7 Exhibit Response to Appeal)(Barker, April) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2018: # 8 Civil Cover Sheet) (amb).
2018-01-172REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Kenneth P. Curran (Barker, April)
2018-01-17NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available on our website; pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (lls)
2018-01-233DISCLOSURE Statement by Kenneth P Curran. (Barker, April)
2018-01-23Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service. (asc)
2018-01-234Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth P Curran. (Barker, April)
2018-03-135Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by United States Postal Service. (Larsen, Christian)
2018-03-136ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/13/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge J.P. Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
2018-03-137MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Christian)
2018-03-20TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/20/2018. The defendant's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 7 ) is granted. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than May 4, 2018. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
2018-04-178Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Kenneth P Curran served upon Attorney General of the United States on March 3, 2018 (Barker, April)
2018-04-179Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Kenneth P Curran served upon United States Postal Service on March 3, 2018 (Barker, April)
2018-04-1710Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Kenneth P Curran served upon Civil-Process Clerk, U.S. Attorneys' Office on March 3, 2018 (Barker, April)
2018-04-1711Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Kenneth P Curran served upon Attorney General of the United States on April 4, 2018 (Barker, April)
2018-04-1712Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Kenneth P Curran served upon Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorneys' Office on April 4, 2018 (Barker, April)
2018-04-1713Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Kenneth P Curran served upon United States Postal Service on April 4, 2018 (Barker, April)
2018-05-0414Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by United States Postal Service.(Larsen, Christian)
2018-05-0815NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. Rule 26(f) report shall be electronically filed with the court no later than May 18, 2018. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
2018-05-0816LETTER from Attorney Barker regarding request for rescheduling . (Barker, April)
2018-05-15RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference RESET for 6/5/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. Rule 26(f) report shall be electronically filed with the court no later than 6/1/2018. (lz)
2018-05-1617Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by United States Postal Service. (Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-0518Minute Entry for Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Court will issue an Order with deadlines. (Tape #9:30:41-9:32:29; 9:39:40-9:50:00) (mlm) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-0619SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/5/2018. The defendant's submission addressing whether the defendant properly withheld documents responsive to a Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) request shall be filed on or before August 1, 2018, along with the Vaughn Index. Plaintiff's response to the defendant's submission is due within 30 days of receipt of the defendant's submission. Defendant shall reply no later than 14 days after receipt of the plaintiff's response. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff