Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00121
Date Filed2018-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning Oil/Gas Lease Sales in Wyoming and Montana. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told WildEarth Guardians that the requests would be put on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-191COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5293992) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/19/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-19Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsth) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-02-013Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/25/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-225NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-286ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Peterson, Benton) Modified to add link on 3/1/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-057NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Kagan on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Kagan, Neil) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/6/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-05-188ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn Index with a supporting motion to dismiss or motion for summary judgment by 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/18. (lsj) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-309NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Neil S. Kagan terminated. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-07-1210Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff