Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCochran v. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2018cv00200
Date Filed2018-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ellen L. Hollander
PlaintiffTerry Cochran
Case DescriptionTerry Cochran, a federal employee, submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records concerning a report of investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cochran filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security (DHS) Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-221COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security (DHS) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637031460.), filed by Terry Cochran. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 certificate of service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 proposed summons)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-312ORDER Directing clerk to prepare and issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/31/2018. (c/m 1/31/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-313Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (c/m 1/31/18 bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-054SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cochran. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) served on 2/3/2018, answer due 4/4/2018.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-265MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00200-ELH, 1:18-cv-00201-ELH, 1:18-cv-00202-ELH(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-266ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/26/2018. (c/m 2/26/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-04-047MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-068ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/5/2018. (c/m 4/6/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) . (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-189NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Chalpin on behalf of Terry Cochran (Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-0210Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0211ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/2/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-0712ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Homeland Security (DHS).(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0713Consent MOTION to Stay the Case by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0714ORDER Granting 13 Consent Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/7/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-0615Status Report Submitted pursuant to Court's Order (ECF 14) by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-07-1016Status Report Submitted in accordance with ECF 14 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff