Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCochran v. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2018cv00202
Date Filed2018-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ellen L. Hollander
PlaintiffTerry Cochran
Case DescriptionTerry Cochran, a federal employee, submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for his family and medical leave records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cochran filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security (DHS) Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-221COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security (DHS) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637031461.), filed by Terry Cochran. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-312ORDER directing Clerk to prepare and issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/31/2018. (c/m 1/31/18 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-313Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (c/m 1/31/18 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-054SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cochran. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) served on 2/3/2018, answer due 4/4/2018.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-265MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00200-ELH, 1:18-cv-00201-ELH, 1:18-cv-00202-ELH(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-266ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/26/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 2.27.18) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-04-047MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-058Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Terry Cochran. (c/m 4/5/18 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-209NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Chalpin on behalf of Terry Cochran (Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2010Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Terry Cochran (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2011ORDER granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/20/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-0712Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Terry Cochran (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0713ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/7/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-2514Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Terry Cochran (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-2515ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/25/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-1816RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Terry Cochran. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-07-0217Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 Response in Opposition to Motion by Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-0218ORDER granting 17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/2/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-1319Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff