Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00146
Date Filed2018-01-23
Date Closed2018-05-10
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning agreements, certifications, oaths, commitments or other pledges required to be signed by political appointees or career staff prior to or in connection with their employment at HHS. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HHS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5298176) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons for USAO, # 4 Summons for AG, # 5 Summons for HHS)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-23Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-02-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/29/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/29/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-285NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-286ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified to add link on 3/1/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-01MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/1/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-157Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by March 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/16/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-308Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by April 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/3/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2018. (kh) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-269Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-30MINUTE ORDER: It appears that the 9 Joint Status Report, which relates to another case, was filed in error. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall refile their Joint Status Report by May 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/30/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2018 (kh) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-3010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by May 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/1/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-1011NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff