Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00149
Date Filed2018-01-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning releases of prescription drugs to the Medical Office of the White House from the Navy since January 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but immediately closed it because the agency claimed they were not agency records. The Navy also indicated that if such records existed, they might be held by the Defense Health Agency. Property of the People and Shapiro filed an administrative appeal of the Navy's decision. Property of the People and Shapiro also submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Health Agency for the same records. That agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-231COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5299212) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-24Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-243SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/24/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/23/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 1/29/2018; DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 1/29/2018 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-225Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-22ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before March 19, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/22/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer due by 3/19/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-196ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Simon, Jeremy) Modified to add link on 3/20/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 2, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/19/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/2/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-027Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 status report and ORDERS that: (1) Defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment on or before June 20, 2018; (2) Plaintiffs shall file a joint opposition and cross-motion on or before July 23, 2018; (3) Defendants shall file a reply and opposition on or before August 21, 2018; and Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before September 20, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/2/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 6/20/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/23/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/21/2018. Plaintiffs shall file a reply by 9/20/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-118Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff