Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOcean Conservancy v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2018cv00208
Date Filed2018-01-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Theodore D. Chuang
PlaintiffOcean Conservancy
Case DescriptionThe Ocean Conservancy submitted a FOIA request to the National Marine Fisheries Service for records concerning a temporary rule reopening the Gulf of Mexico private angler and red snapper fishing season and extending the length of the season. The Ocean Conservancy also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Ocean Conservancy's request for a fee waiver, although it subsequently questioned whether the Ocean Conservancy had a commercial interest in its request. The agency provided an interim disclosure of 38 documents, but after hearing nothing further from the agency as to when it would release more responsive records, the Ocean Conservancy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service
DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7115347.), filed by Ocean Conservancy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 NMFS Summons, # 3 NOAA Summons, # 4 US Attorney Summons, # 5 US Attorney General Summons)(Desai, Khushi) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-232Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ocean Conservancy (Desai, Khushi) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-233MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brettny Hardy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7115675.) by Ocean Conservancy(Desai, Khushi) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-234MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher D. Eaton (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7115689.) by Ocean Conservancy(Desai, Khushi) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-245Summons Issued 60 days as to National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-256CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/25/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-267PAPERLESS ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brettny Hardy. Directing attorney Brettny Hardy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-268PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Eaton. Directing attorney Christopher Eaton to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-029SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ocean Conservancy. National Marine Fisheries Service served on 1/27/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration served on 1/29/2018, answer due 3/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 NOAA Proof of Service, # 2 Civil Process Clerk Proof of Service, # 3 U.S. Attorney General Proof of Service)(Desai, Khushi) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-2010Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff