Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Department of Commerce
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv00583
Date Filed2018-01-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alison J. Nathan
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning why the Secretary of Commerce found that summer flounder management plan measures the State of New Jersey had failed to implement were unnecessary for conserving summer flounder. The agency provided two interim responses but indicated that there were several other responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Commerce
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-231COMPLAINT against United States Department of Commerce. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14608453)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-232CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-233REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Commerce, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-234RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-24CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-24Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-24Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-245ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Commerce. (pne) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-296NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/29/2018) (ap) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-287ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Commerce.(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-058NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Nathan Carpenter-Gold on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Carpenter-Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-089AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Department of Commerce served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/26/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-0810LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel Carpenter-Gold dated March 8, 2018 re: Clarification of Initial Pretrial Conference Date. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Carpenter-Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-1411MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 10 Letter filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for June 15, 2018, at 3:15pm. (Initial Conference set for 6/15/2018 at 3:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/14/2018) (ap) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-2912JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jennifer Jude dated 3/29/18 re: Status Update. Document filed by United States Department of Commerce.(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-0613ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for Friday, June 15th, 2018 at 3:30pm, is hereby adjourned to June 29, 2018, at 3:00pm. The documents discussed at Docket Number 6 are due seven days before the conference. (Initial Conference set for 6/29/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/6/2018) (ap) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-06-2214INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Letter from Parties)(Carpenter-Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2615MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 14 Initial Report of Parties Before Pretrial Conference filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, June 29 is hereby adjourned sine die. The parties shall file a joint status report by no later than July 13, 2018. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/26/2018) (cf) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-0316CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schnapp, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-1317JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel Carpenter-Gold and Jennifer Jude dated July 13, 2018 re: joint status update. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Carpenter-Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1318MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Letter filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff