Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00154
Date Filed2018-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning electronic communications between FBI agent Peter Strozk and FBI attorney Lisa Page, as well as travel vouchers and expense reports for both Strozk and Page. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that unusual circumstances applied in the processing of its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5300900) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-24Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/2/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/02/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/2/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Attorney for DC), # 2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Attorney General), # 3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Department of Justice))(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-03-145Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Answer)(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER granting 5 . Upon consideration of the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's answer, attached as an exhibit to the motion, is hereby entered on the docket and deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 15, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-156GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 15, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this action qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before April 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 15, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-157ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(zrdj) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule due by 4/5/2018. (hs) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-058PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order, to Govern Further Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule Governing Further Proceedings, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall process the 35 pages of records it has identified as potentially responsive to the second and third categories of the plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request and produce any responsive, non-exempt records on or before May 4, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case on or before May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 5, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/4/2018; Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-05-179Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' proposed schedule is ADOPTED. It is further ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI") shall process the 500 pages of potentially responsive records and produce any responsive, non-exempt records to the plaintiff on or before June 29, 2018; (2) after June 29, 2018, the FBI, on a monthly basis, shall process 500 pages of potentially responsive records and produce any responsive, non-exempt records to the plaintiff; and (3) on September 1, 2018, and thereafter on a quarterly basis (once every three months), on the first day of the month (or, if the first falls on a weekend or holiday, the next business day), the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the FBI's progress in processing the request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 21, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-0110MOTION for Order for Preservation by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-0811ERRATA by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. 10 MOTION for Order for Preservation filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-1112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION for Order for Preservation by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting 12 . Upon consideration of the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a Two-Business-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preservation Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's motion on or before June 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 11, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 6/19/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1913Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Order for Preservation filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-2514REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Order for Preservation filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-08-0915NOTICE of Recent Development by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 10 MOTION for Order for Preservation (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-0416Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-2617NOTICE of Change of Address by Garrett Joseph Coyle (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-11-1318ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Preservation Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 13, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-3019Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-2720Unopposed MOTION to Stay December 29, 2018 Production Deadline by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 20 Government's Unopposed Motion to Stay December 29 Production Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the defendant seeks to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 2, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the continued lapse in appropriations, it is hereby ORDERED that the previously imposed deadline for filing a joint status report on or before January 28, 2019, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before fourteen days after appropriations have been restored, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing new deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 23, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-3121Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Post-Shutdown Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-04-0122Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' proposed schedule is ADOPTED. It is further ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) after March 29, 2019, the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI"), shall, on a monthly basis, process 500 pages of potentially responsive records and produce any responsive, non-exempt records to the plaintiff; and (2) on July 1, 2019, and thereafter on a quarterly basis (once every three months), on the first day of the month (or, if the first falls on a weekend or holiday, the next business day), the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the FBI's progress in processing the request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-07-0123Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon further consideration, the Court is concerned that the processing rate adopted by the Court may be inadequate. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on July 30, 2019, at 11:00 a.m., to address the appropriate processing rate in this matter. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 24, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-25Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-30Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 7/30/2019. Next Status Report due 9/30/2019. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-3024ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the processing rate of 500 pages per month shall remain in effect pending further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before September 30, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing, inter alia, their efforts to narrow the scope of the plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request and potential utilization of deduplication software to expedite the processing of the plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 30, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019 (hs) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-09-2525TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on July 30, 2019; Page Numbers: 1 - 12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 10/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2019.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-3026NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Ehrlich on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Ehrlich, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-3027Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Ehrlich, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar