Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv00650
Date Filed2018-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior and the Department of Commerce for records concerning public comments and communications with outside parties pertaining to their review of national monuments. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after nothing further from either agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantU.S. Department of Commerce
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-241COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14616871)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A 2017.09.22 DOI FOIA Request, # 2 Ex B 2017.10.29 DOI FOIA Request., # 3 Ex C 2017.10.29 DOC FOIA Request)(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-242CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-243REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Interior, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-244REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Commerce, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-245RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-25CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-25Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-25Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-256ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Interior. (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-257ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Commerce. (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-258MOTION for Katherine Desormeau to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14624155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-26>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Katherine Desormeau to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14624155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-299ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 8 Motion for Katherine Desormeau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/29/2018) (ama) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-2110NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl, and as further set forth in this order. (ap) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-1511NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Kraemer, Talia) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1512CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Talia Kraemer dated 3/15/2018. Document filed by U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of the Interior.(Kraemer, Talia) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1713ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/17/2018) (ama) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines: U.S. Department of Commerce answer due 3/23/2018; U.S. Department of the Interior answer due 3/23/2018. (ama) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-2314ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of the Interior.(Kraemer, Talia) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2615AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. All Defendants. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summons Department of Commerce, # 2 Exhibit B - Summons Department of the Interior, # 3 Exhibit C - Certified Mail Receipt DOJ, # 4 Exhibit D- Certified Mail Receipt USAO, # 5 Exhibit E - FedEx Receipt USAO)(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2916CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Katherine Desormeau dated 03/29/2018. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2917ORDER granting 16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Adjourned to Tuesday, May 15, 2018, at 4:30 pm. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/29/2018) (rj) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-05-0418JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Katherine Desormeau, Talia Kraemer dated 05/04/2018 re: Initial conference and parties' Rule 26(f) report. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-1519CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., U.S. Department of the Interior. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/15/2018) (ap) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/15/2018. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-05-16Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so redesignated. (wb) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-2120SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall attend a status conference on June 7, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 20D. (Status Conference set for 6/7/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/15/2018) (rro) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2421LETTER MOTION for Conference request to allow telephonic appearance or appearance of non-lead counsel at status conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Katherine Desormeau dated 05/24/2018. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2922ORDER granting 21 Letter Motion for Conference. The application is GRANTED. Ms. Desormeau is permitted to appear telephonically so long as Ms. Marks attends in person. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/29/2018) (rro) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-0423JOINT PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT with proposed agenda . Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 6/7/2018. (Court Reporter Mike McDaniel)Status Conference held. Joint Status letter due August 8, 2018. (Quinn, Diane) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-08-0824JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Katherine Desormeau, Talia Kraemer dated 08/08/2018 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-1425MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 24 Letter filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall submit the next joint status report on October 8, 2018. The Court declines to issue an advisory ethics opinion concerning the unredacted documents currently circulating in the public domain. SO ORDERED. (Status Report due by 10/8/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/14/2018) (rro) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-10-0826STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Desormeau, Katherine) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-0927MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 26 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court agrees with the parties' proposals. The parties shall submit the next joint status report on December 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/9/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar