Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSui v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv00107
Date Filed2018-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S Martinez
PlaintiffJian Wei (Bruce) Sui
Case DescriptionJian Sui, a lawful permanent resident, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and the FBI for records concerning allegations that he was involved in an alien smuggling scheme before being admitted to the United States. The agencies acknowledged receipt of requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Sui filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantJill A. Eggleston Director of USCIS FOIA Operations
DefendantDavid Hardy Section Chief of the Records Management Division of the FBI
DefendantKirstjen M. Nielsen Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
DefendantJefferson Sessions Attorney General of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5174711) Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Jian Wei Sui(pty:pla), filed by Jian Wei Sui. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Pauw, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-25Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (DJ) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-252Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Jill A. Eggleston, Federal Bureau of Investigation, David Hardy, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Sessions, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(DJ) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-02-103AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Civil Process Clerk, AUSA on 1/29/2018, filed by Plaintiff Jian Wei (Bruce) Sui. (Pauw, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2018)
2018-02-274NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants Jill A. Eggleston, Federal Bureau of Investigation, David Hardy, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Sessions, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-275ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Jill A. Eggleston, Federal Bureau of Investigation, David Hardy, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Sessions, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Morehead, Sarah) (Corrected Attachment 1 replaced on 2/27/2018) (vb). Modified on 2/27/2018 (vb). (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-276NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 5 Answer to Complaint, Attachment: Exhibit A and B. (Service of corrected image is attached). (vb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-287AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Jill A. Eggleston, Federal Bureau of Investigation, David Hardy, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson Sessions, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff