Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00160
Date Filed2018-01-25
Date Closed2018-05-08
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the General Services Administration for records concerning a contract awarded to My Pillow, whose CEO had been a major contributor to the Trump campaign, for pillows throughout the federal government. American Oversight also requested any contacts with GSA on behalf of My Pillow from either outside parties or the White House. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-251COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5302987) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for USAO, # 3 Summons for AG, # 4 Summons for GSA)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-26Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 2/2/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-075NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-076ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Field, Brian) Modified to add link on 3/8/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 4/8/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/8/18. (DJS) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-057Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joints status report 7 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by May 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/5/18 Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/5/18. (DJS) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Order due by 5/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-05-088NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-089ORDER: Dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/8/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff