Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv00659
Date Filed2018-01-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronnie Abrams
PlaintiffNational Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild
PlaintiffMargaret Satterthwaite
Case DescriptionThe National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning the government's decision to terminate Temporary Protected Status to Haitian refugees. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, The National Immigration Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of State
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-251FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-252COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland (DHS), Department of State - USA, Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14620466)Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-253FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Geoffrey Berman, U.S. Attorney, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-254FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Attorney General, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-255FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Maher, Office of the General Counsel, DHS, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-256FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Legal Adviser, DOS, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-257FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ICE, Office of the Principal Legal Advisor, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-258RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite.(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-259NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Babette Morawetz on behalf of National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-2510NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sejal Ramnik Zota on behalf of National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild. (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-2511NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sejal Ramnik Zota on behalf of Margaret Satterthwaite. (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Louise Rofe. The party information for the following parties has been modified: Department of Homeland (DHS), Department of State - USA, Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), and Margaret Satterthwaite. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reason: party name contained a typographical error. (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jessica Louise Rofe. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Suffolk; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jessica Louise Rofe to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the caption entered on the civil cover sheet form does not match the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-2612CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica Louise Rofe to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: The parties names for whom the issuance of summons is requested is not listed on the pleading; the defendant's name the summons is addressed to was entered incorrectly on the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-29NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-2913REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-2914REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-2915REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 2 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-3016ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (vf) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-3017ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (vf) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-3018ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (vf) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-3019SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/30/2018, answer due 2/20/2018; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 1/30/2018, answer due 2/20/2018; United States Department of State served on 1/30/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild; Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-3120ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Plaintiffs are directed to notify the Court when service has been executed on Defendants, after which the Court will promptly schedule an initial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/31/2018) (rj) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-0221ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on February 15, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by February 12, 2018, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs. Plaintiffs are ordered to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/02/2018) (ama) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-0522NOTICE of Service of Court's Order. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0523NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caleb Hayes-Deats on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-1224LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated February 12, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated February 12, 2018. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-1225ORDER granting 24 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated February 12, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated February 12, 2018. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. Application granted. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.); granting 24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/12/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-1426NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Jessica Louise Rofe on behalf of National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-1427NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Jessica Louise Rofe on behalf of National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-1428FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint,, against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. Related document: 2 Complaint,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Rofe, Jessica) Modified on 2/15/2018 (pc). (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-1429FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 28 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) Modified on 2/15/2018 (pc). (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Louise Rofe to RE-FILE re: Document No. 28 Amended Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Parties added to CM ECF must exactly match what is listed on the amended complaint caption title. Add United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) Modified on 2/15/2018 (pc). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica Louise Rofe to RE-FILE Document No. 29 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1530FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint,, 28 Amended Complaint,,, against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. Related document: 2 Complaint,, 28 Amended Complaint,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1531FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 30 Amended Complaint. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) Modified on 2/15/2018 (sj). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1532ORDER: LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM. I authorize this student: Sarah D. Thompson (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/15/2018) (ap) Modified on 4/11/2018 (ap). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1533ORDER: LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM. I authorize this student: Kevin Siegel (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/15/2018) (ap) Modified on 4/11/2018 (ap). Modified on 4/11/2018 (ap). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1534ORDER: LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: Nora Searle (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/15/2018) (ap) Modified on 4/11/2018 (ap). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1535ORDER: LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: Fatima Carrillo (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/15/2018) (ap) Modified on 4/11/2018 (ap). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica Louise Rofe to RE-FILE Document No. 31 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): All parties must be listed in caption. If all defendant's names do not fit, list leading defendant followed by "et al". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1536REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 30 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1637ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (laq) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1638LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nancy Morawetz and Caleb Hayes-Deats dated 02/16/2018 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite.(Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2018. (arc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2039SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/16/2018, answer due 3/9/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild; Margaret Satterthwaite. (Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-03-0140ANSWER to 30 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (arc) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-0841LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nancy Morawetz & Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 8, 2018 re: update in advance of pre-trial conference. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 3/9/2018. (Court Reporter Pam Utter) (arc) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-1342LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 13, 2018 re: update concerning the parties' discussions of prioritization. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1643LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 16, 2018. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-1644ORDER granting 43 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/16/2018) (anc) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-1645LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 16, 2018 re: Defendants' request that the Court set a schedule requiring them to process 300 to 500 pages per month. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of James Holzer dated March 14, 2018, # 2 Affidavit Decl. of Jill Eggleston dated March 16, 2018, # 3 Affidavit Decl. of Eric Stein dated March 16, 2018, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from transcript of March 9th conference)(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-1946LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 19, 2018 re: two non-substantive corrections to the declaration of James Holzer. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Decl. of James Holzer)(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-2047TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2018 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2048NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/9/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2349LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nancy Morawetz dated 3/23/2018 re: Production Schedule and Expedition. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2850LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 28, 2018 re: request that the Court consider this letter in reply to Plaintiffs' newly raised arguments for expedited processing. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-2951LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nancy Morawetz dated 03/29/2018 re: Correction to Letter Dated 3/23/2018. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite.(Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2952LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 29, 2018 re: submission of supplemental declaration to ensure that the record is complete regarding DHS's practices for recording FOIA requests in 2016 & 2017. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Nicole C. Barksdale-Perry)(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2953LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nancy Morawetz & Caleb Hayes-Deats dated March 29, 2018 re: the parties' proposed briefing schedules. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-0454LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nancy Morawetz and Caleb Hayes-Deats dated April 4, 2018 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite.(Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 4/5/2018. (Court Reporter Sonya Ketter/Anita Trombetta) (arc) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-0655MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 54 Letter filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. ENDORSEMENT: As discussed at the conference on April 5, 2018, the Court hereby adopts the briefing schedule outlined in the letter above. Furthermore, with regard to the parties' disputes concerning a production schedule, the Court orders a schedule of 1,500 pages processed per month per agency, for the Departments of State and Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/06/2018) (ama) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/7/2018. (ama) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-04-2756MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. Responses due by 5/18/2018(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2757MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2758DECLARATION of Michael D. Isacco, Jr. in Support re: 56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2759DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: 56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-3, # 3 Exhibit 3-7)(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-0160TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0161NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/5/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-1862FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. Responses due by 5/28/2018(Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1863FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE DOCUMENT #64) - FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 56.1 Statement, Exhibits A-B9 . Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. Responses due by 5/28/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2, # 4 Exhibit B3, # 5 Exhibit B4, # 6 Exhibit B5, # 7 Exhibit B6, # 8 Exhibit B7, # 9 Exhibit B8, # 10 Exhibit B9)(Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 5/23/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1864FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 71 Rulr 56.1 Statement) - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2, # 4 Exhibit B3, # 5 Exhibit B4, # 6 Exhibit B5, # 7 Exhibit B6, # 8 Exhibit B7, # 9 Exhibit B8, # 10 Exhibit B9)(Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1865FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 71 Rule 56.1 Statement) - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I)(Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1866FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 71 Rule 56.1 Statement) - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K)(Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1867FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 71 Rule 56.1 Statement) - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R, # 8 Exhibit S, # 9 Exhibit T, # 10 Exhibit U, # 11 Exhibit V, # 12 Exhibit W, # 13 Exhibit X)(Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1868FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 72 Memorandum) - FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 63 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 56.1 Statement, Exhibits A-B9 ., 62 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Morawetz, Nancy) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-2169LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated May 21, 2018. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2270ORDER granting 69 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/22/2018) (ne) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/14/2018. (ne) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-2371RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2, # 4 Exhibit B3, # 5 Exhibit B4, # 6 Exhibit B5, # 7 Exhibit B6, # 8 Exhibit B7, # 9 Exhibit B8, # 10 Exhibit B9, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Exhibit H, # 17 Exhibit I, # 18 Exhibit J, # 19 Exhibit K, # 20 Exhibit L, # 21 Exhibit M, # 22 Exhibit N, # 23 Exhibit O, # 24 Exhibit P, # 25 Exhibit Q, # 26 Exhibit R, # 27 Exhibit S, # 28 Exhibit T, # 29 Exhibit U, # 30 Exhibit V, # 31 Exhibit W, # 32 Exhibit X)(Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-2372AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Morawetz, Nancy) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-0473MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 62 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . and in Further Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-0474COUNTER STATEMENT TO 71 Rule 56.1 Statement,,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-0475DECLARATION of Caleb Hayes-Deats in Opposition re: 62 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-1476FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Plaintiffs' Description of Remaining Disputes Among the Parties, # 2 Appendix B - Federal Register References to Recovery Setbacks in Explanations of Extensions and Terminations of TPS)(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-1477DECLARATION of Jessica L. Rofe in Support re: 62 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Margaret Satterthwaite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-08-0678JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 8/6/18 re: Pending Partial Summary Judgment Motions. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Original State Department Release, # 2 Corrected State Department Cover Letter, # 3 Corrected State Department Release, # 4 USCIS Cover Letter, # 5 USCIS Release)(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-09-0679LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Caleb Hayes-Deats dated September 6, 2018 re: request for an order withdrawing my appearance. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-0780MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 79 Letter filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED., Attorney Caleb Hayes-Deats terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/07/2018) (ama) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar