Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00166
Date Filed2018-01-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications from Chief of Staff Jody Hunt or Counselor to the Attorney General Rachael Tucker expressing views on the outcome of any National Security Division investigation. The agency denied the request citing Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). American Oversight filed administrative appeals, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5305067) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-262LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmd) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/5/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-055Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 5 the government's unopposed motion for extension of time to file, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the government shall file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by not later than March 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/6/2018 (lcjdb2) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/21/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-216ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Bennett, Michelle) Modified to add link on 3/22/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-217ORDER requiring the parties to submit joint or separate proposed schedules for filing dispositive motions by not later than April 18, 2018. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/21/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed briefing schedule for filing of dispositive motions due by 4/18/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-188Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, along with joint or separate proposed briefing schedules, if necessary, by not later than May 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/18/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint or Separate Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/18/2018. (tb) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-189Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-2110SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/21/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/21/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 7/19/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/2/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/16/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-2111MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann, # 4 Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff