Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Department of Defense
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv00709
Date Filed2018-01-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning President Trump's revised principles and standards for counter-terrorism kill-or-capture operations replacing President Obama's policy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-261COMPLAINT against Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14626226)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-262CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-263RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-264STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-9972. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-265REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-29CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 17-CV-9972. (pne) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-296ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense. (pne) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-12CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-09972-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-12NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-12Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (wb) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-03-017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of Department of Defense. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-058NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J Shapiro on behalf of Department of Defense. (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar