Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00167
Date Filed2018-01-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Case DescriptionThe Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights under Law submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity. The Lawyers Committee also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The Justice Department provided an index of Commission records provided in a court case against the Commission. DOJ denied the Lawyers Committee's request for expedited processing but had not yet addressed its request for a fee waiver. The Lawyers Committee asked for the same kinds of records from DHS. DHS closed its request because it failed to sufficiently identify the records requested. The Lawyers Committee then filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5305276) filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Freedman, John) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-262NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-01354. (Freedman, John) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-293NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-30SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-304REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Freedman, John) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-305NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Jacobson on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Jacobson, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-306NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Weiner on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Weiner, David) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-307NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Neil Weiner on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Weiner, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-318NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Alexander Rubel on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (jf) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-319SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-0610Case randomly reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case as not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-0811STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/08/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-2012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/3/2018. (Freedman, John) Modified date of service and answer deadline on 2/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/1/2018. (Freedman, John) Modified date of service on 2/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/1/2018 (Freedman, John) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/1/2018 (Freedman, John) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/3/2018, (znmw) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-0516NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of All Defendants (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0517ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Federighi, Carol) Modified to add link on 3/6/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-07MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than April 13, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 7, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/13/2018. (mac) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0918NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Rosenberg by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Freedman, John) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-12NOTICE OF ERROR re 18 Notice (Other); emailed to john.freedman@apks.com, cc'd 12 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, appearing attorney must file own appearance using his assigned ECF login; Do not refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-04-1319NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1320NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1321Joint STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULING PROPOSAL by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Freedman, John) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-25MINUTE ORDER. In view of 21 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Department of Justice shall complete its production of responsive documents and Vaughn index(es) by no later than June 1, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Department of Homeland Security shall complete loading its records into its FOIA processing system by no later than April 30, 2018 and provide its first production of documents to plaintiffs by no later than May 25, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Department of Homeland Security shall submit a report to the Court of the number of documents potentially responsive to plaintiffs' FOIA request and its proposed dates for release of those documents, including the date on which it proposes to complete its production, by no later than May 25, 2018. The Court declines to set a briefing schedule for dispositive motions at this time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 25, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Department Of Homeland Security Report To The Court due by 5/25/2018. (mac) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-2522STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-29MINUTE ORDER. In view of 22 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 29, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2018. (mac) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff