Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv00222
Date Filed2018-01-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Marcia S. Krieger
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning import permits for African elephant sport-hunted trophies from Zimbabwe and/or Zambia. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed it in its complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-291COMPLAINT against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5917464)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-292Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-293SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-014ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to: (1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters; (2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance; (3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/1/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-025ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/2/18. Text Only Entry (pglov) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-126NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zeyen Julian Wu on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife ServiceAttorney Zeyen Julian Wu added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) (Wu, Zeyen) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-157ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/15/18. A Status Conference is set for 3/16/2018 11:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff