Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCODREA v. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00201
Date Filed2018-01-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffDAVID CODREA
Case DescriptionDavid Codrea, an Internet blogger on gun-rights issues, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning Devin Kelley, who Codrea believed had received a bad conduct discharge in 2014. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but, in conjunction with the FBI, denied Codrea's request. Codrea filed an administrative appeal, which was denied by the Department of Justice. Codrea then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-291ENTERED IN ERROR.....CIVIL COVER SHEET and Complaint by DAVID CODREA filed by DAVID CODREA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A D. Kelley FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Acknowledgement Letter Stamboulieh, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C 2018-00645-F Stamboulieh, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Kelley Appeal 12.3.2017, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Stamboulieh, Stephen, DOJ-AP-2018-001271, FBI, Response letter, Affirm 7A, # 6 Summons Summons on Air Force, # 7 Summons Summons on AG, # 8 Summons Summons on US ATTY)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 1/30/2018 (zsth). (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-292CIVIL COVER SHEET by DAVID CODREA filed by DAVID CODREA.(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-293COMPLAINT with filing fee payment against DEPARTMENT OF AIR FORCE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5308307) filed by DAVID CODREA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A D. Kelley FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Acknowledgement Letter Stamboulieh, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C 2018-00645-F Stamboulieh, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Kelley Appeal 12.3.2017, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Stamboulieh, Stephen, DOJ-AP-2018-001271, FBI, Response letter, Affirm 7A, # 6 Summons Summons on Air Force, # 7 Summons Summons on AG, # 8 Summons Summons on US ATTY)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-29Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsth) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-305STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/30/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Photograph of Mailing)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF AIR FORCE served on 2/5/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Department of Air Force Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Photograph of Mailing)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Atty General Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Photograph of Mailing)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-03-079ANSWER to 3 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified to add link on 3/8/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-08MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on March 15, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/8/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/15/2018, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-0910Joint STATUS REPORT requesting dispositive motion schedule and to vacate Status Conference by DAVID CODREA. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their dispositive motion on or before May 31, 2018; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion on or before June 29, 2018; and Defendants shall file their reply on or before July 20, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for March 15, 2018 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/12/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Dispositive motion is due by 5/31/2018; Plaintiff Opposition is due by 6/29/2018; Defendants Reply is due by 7/20/2018. (jth) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-05-3111Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defenadnts' Dispositive Motion by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion to Enlarge Time to File Defendants' Dispositive Motion 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their dispositive motion on or before June 29, 2018; Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before July 30, 2018; Defendants shall file their reply on or before August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/5/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file their dispositive motion on or before 6/29/2018; Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before 7/30/2018; Defendants shall file their reply on or before 8/20/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-2912Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Dispositive Motion by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Defendants' Dispositive Motion 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their dispositive motion on or before July 30, 2018; Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before August 30, 2018; and Defendants shall file their reply on or before September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/29/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2018; Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018. (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-3013Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Dispositive Motion by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Defendants' Dispositive Motion 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their dispositive motion on or before August 14, 2018; Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before September 14, 2018; and Defendants shall file their reply on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/1/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file their dispositive motion on or before 8/14/2018; Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before 9/14/2018; Defendants shall file their reply on or before 10/5/2018. (kt) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar