Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNorthwest Environmental Advocates v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2018cv00190
Date Filed2018-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman
PlaintiffNorthwest Environmental Advocates an Oregon non-profit corporation
DefendantAnimal and Plant Health Inspection Service an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-301Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5295326 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-302Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/30/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/29/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 6/29/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-303Summons Issued Electronically as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-304Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-015Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul A. Kampmeier . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5297853. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-016ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul A. Kampmeier for Northwest Environmental Advocates. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5297853 issued. Signed on 2/1/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-227Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-228Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-079Joint Motion to Establish Answer and Rule 26(f) Conference Deadlines . Filed by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0810ORDER: Granting Joint Motion to Establish Answer and Rule 26(f) Conference Deadlines (ECF No. 9 ). Answer or other responsive pleading due 3/26/2018. The deadline for the parties to hold a Rule 26(f) conference is 3/30/2018. Ordered on 3/8/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-2611Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-1312Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Rule 26(f) Deadline . Filed by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1613ORDER: Granting Joint Motion to Extend the Rule 26(f) Deadline (ECF No. 12 ). The deadline for the Rule 26(f) conference is extended to 5/3/2018. Ordered on 4/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-2014SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, May 9, 2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-0315Joint Motion for Revised Case Schedule . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-0316ORDER REVISING CASE SCHEDULE. Granting Joint Motion for Revised Case Schedule (ECF No. 15 ). The Rule 16 conference previously set for 5/9/2018 is CANCELED. Joint Status Report is due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 5/3/2018. (gw) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar