Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern States Fire Protection Company v. General Services Administration
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv00248
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date Closed2018-03-19
JudgeMagistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang
PlaintiffWestern States Fire Protection Company
Case DescriptionThe Western States Fire Protection Company submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for a copy of an identified contract between the agency and Primestar. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western States Fire Protection Company filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGeneral Services Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT against General Services Administration (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5921994)Attorney Walter John Downing added to party Western States Fire Protection Company(pty:pla), filed by Western States Fire Protection Company.(Downing, Walter) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-312ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Walter J. Downing.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-313Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-314Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-315SUMMONS REQUEST as to General Services Administration by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company. (Downing, Walter) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-316NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company (Downing, Walter) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-317STATEMENT Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company. (Downing, Walter) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-018SUMMONS issued by Clerk, to General Services Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-029NOTICE Notice of Service by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Downing, Walter) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-0610ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/6/2018. A Status Conference is set for 3/14/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 2/28/2018 . (bwilk, ) Modified on 2/6/2018 to correct typo (bwilk, ). (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-2611Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company. (Downing, Walter) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2612CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company All parties consent.. (Downing, Walter) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2613NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Hunter Weiss on behalf of General Services AdministrationAttorney Sarah Hunter Weiss added to party General Services Administration(pty:dft) (Weiss, Sarah) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2714ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Pursuant to the parties' consent 12 and 28 USC 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Wang to fully preside over for all purposes. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/27/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-2715ORDER granting 11 Motion to Continue. The Status Conference set for 3/14/2018 is VACATED and RESET to 3/20/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Counsel are reminded they must comply with Local Rule 6.1(c), and failure to do so in the future may result in the court striking the motion without substantive consideration. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/27/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-1916NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Western States Fire Protection Company (Downing, Walter) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-1917MINUTE ORDER: in light of the 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by Western States Fire Protection Company, the Status Conference set for 3/20/2018 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/19/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-1918Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 3/19/18. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff