Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00216
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ('FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for email communications to and from Sally Yates when she was serving as Deputy Attorney General and Acting Attorney General during January 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked FAIR to narrow the scope of its request. It did so by identifying certain keywords concerning the travel ban. FAIR submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning any communications Yates had with the ACLU or the National Immigration Law Center. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5311047) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for Defendant, # 4 Summons for U.S. Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-013LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-274ENTERED IN ERROR.....Receipt on 02/27/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca216. (jf) Modified on 2/28/2018 (jf). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 4 Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents was entered in error and will be refiled in the correct case.(jf) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/9/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/9/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2018.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-126NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Bickford, James) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-127ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Bickford, James) Modified to add link on 3/13/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-13MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report no later than April 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 13, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-04-068Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-10MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Accordingly, the parties' joint status report shall be filed on or before April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 10, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/27/2018. (jl) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-279Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-30MINUTE ORDER approving the proposed schedule set forth in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Department of Justice shall make its first production on May 11, 2018 and a second production on June 8, 2018. It further is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 30, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-3010NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Miano on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Miano, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/31/2018) (jf). (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-0811NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-07-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 6, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-2713Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 6, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/30/2018 (JK) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 31, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-1215NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L. Casale on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-0416Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 9, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-11-0917Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 12, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
2018-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/14/2018. (jl) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar