Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00220
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date Closed2018-07-12
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications with former director James Comey pertaining to his Senate testimony, his plans to write a book, and any prepublication requirements. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5311366) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-312LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-01Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/05/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/5/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Attorney for DC), # 2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Attorney General), # 3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Department of Justice))(Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-03-155Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-18MINUTE ORDER: Granting Nunc Pro Tunc 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer, attached as an exhibit to Defendant's motion, is hereby deemed filed on the thirtieth day following service of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/18/18. (DJS) (Entered: 03/18/2018)
2018-03-186ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; ("Nunc Pro Tunc, deemed filed on the thirtieth day following service of the Complaint" per Minute Order of 3/18/18)(td) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 5/3/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/18. (DJS) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2018. (jl) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-027Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 7 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Plaintiff shall identify any issues with Defendant's search or production that Plaintiff intends to challenge by May 14, 2018. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by June 15, 2018. Plaintiff's response and combined cross-motion due July 16, 2018. Defendant's combined reply/response due July 30, 2018. Plaintiff's reply due August 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/3/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/15/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 7/16/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 7/30/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/13/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-06-138Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Briefing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Granting 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by July 16, 2018. Plaintiff 's combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion due by August 16, 2018. Defendant's combined reply/response due August 30, 2018. Plaintiff's reply due September 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/15/18. (DJS) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 7/16/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 8/16/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/30/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/13/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-129STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1210ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/12/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff