Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00224
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's decision to share text messages between FBI agent Peter Strzok and FBI attorney Lisa Page with the media and records concerning the investigation of the incident by the Office of Inspector General. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. Some components of DOJ granted American Oversight's request for expedited processing while others had not responded by the time American Oversight filed suit. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5311883) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons for USAO, # 10 Summons For AG, # 11 Summons For DOJ)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-312LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (jd) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-074ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/8/2018. (DM) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/9/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/9/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-126NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita Balakrishnan Andrapalliyal on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-127ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) Modified to add link on 3/13/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-208ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than APRIL 19, 2018 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 20, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Schedule due by 4/19/2018. (dot) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-199Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant's Office of Information Policy, the Office of the Inspector General, the Office of Legal Counsel, and the Federal Bureau of Investigation are at varying stages of their review and production of documents in response to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. The Court adopts the parties' proposal that they submit a further Joint Status Report by MAY 30, 2018 , that indicates the volume of potentially responsive documents that remain to be reviewed, proposes a schedule for the completion of production, and identifies a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 3, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/30/2018. (dot) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-3010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant's Office of Information Policy, the Office of the Inspector General, the Office of Legal Counsel, and the Federal Bureau of Investigation have made further progress in their review and production of documents in response to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by SEPTEMBER 14, 2018 , that confirms whether Defendant has completed its production and identifies a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 8, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018, that confirms whether Defendant has completed its production and identifies a briefing schedule. (dot) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar