Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00232
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for Secretary Ryan Zinke's communications records, Vincent DeVito's communications records, Katherine MacGregor's communications records, and David Bernhardt's communications records. The agency acknowledged receipt of all four requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR Office of the Secretary ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5312414) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Summons to Dept. of Interior)(Kagan, Neil) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-312Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsth) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-024STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/02/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-085CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS re 4 Order, . (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-206NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-217NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Nokes on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Nokes, Kelly) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/22/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/20/2018. (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2018. (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 2/20/2018 (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-2311Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting 11 government's consent motion for extension of time to file answer. Therefore, the defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond, to the plaintiff's complaint by April 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/23/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 4/24/2018. (mac) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-2412ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-3013NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Neil S. Kagan terminated. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than July 12, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/12/2018. (lcegs3). (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/12/2018. (mac) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-1214Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORER in view of 14 joint status report, in which the parties state that the defendant is currently conducting document searches, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by August 7, 2018 following the government's first document release on July 31, 2018. The joint status report shall contain recommendations for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/16/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2018. (mac) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff