Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00233
Date Filed2018-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning communications records for John Rehs and Mike Nedd. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-311COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5312490) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to AG, # 3 Summons Summons to USA, # 4 Summons Summons to BLM)(Kagan, Neil) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2018) (jd). (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-312Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-084CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS . (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-03-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 2/14/2018 (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/15/2018. (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2018. (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-088NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-169Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-19MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading now is due on or before April 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/19/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-2710NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Nokes on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Nokes, Kelly) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/28/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-1911ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-1912ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 4, 2018. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/19/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-0413Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before June 4, 2018, that advises the court about the status of Plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/4/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/06/2018)
2018-05-3014NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Neil S. Kagan terminated. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-0415Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-06MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before June 22, 2018, that advises the court about the status of Plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/6/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-25MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before July 27, 2018, that advises the court about the status of Plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/25/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-2717Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 17 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. The parties' Joint Status Report now is due on or before August 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/27/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-0618Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-08MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file an additional Joint Status Report on or before September 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/8/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-1819NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly E. Nokes (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-1820Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/20/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-11-0121Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/2/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar