Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. US Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv00722
Date Filed2018-02-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the way in which the agency processes FOIA requests since the beginning of the Trump administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Sierra Club that its request was unlikely to incur any fees. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUS Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-011COMPLAINT against US Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12077556.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-012Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-013Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Heather) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-014Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-015Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/1/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-026Summons Issued as to US Environmental Protection Agency. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-157CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Lewis, Heather) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-158MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. Cmar ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12116383.) filed by Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Oath per L.R. 11-3(a) in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas J. Cmar)(Cmar, Thomas) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-209ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas J. Cmar. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2710AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Other Initiating Documents served on Defendant U.S. EPA, U.S. Attorney's Office, and Attorney General of the U.S. on 2/8/2018, filed by Sierra Club. (Cmar, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2018) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-1411ANSWER to Complaint by US Environmental Protection Agency. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1412CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by US Environmental Protection Agency.. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1913STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by US Environmental Protection Agency. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 3/19/2018) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-2014ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 13 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/31/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-1915NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 4/19/2018) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-2016ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, May 16, 2018, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-1017ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lewis, Heather) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1618ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 5/16/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-2319JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by US Environmental Protection Agency. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-3120Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/31/2018. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time: 4 mins) Attorneys for Plaintiff: Heather Lewis; Stacey Geis. Attorney for Defendant: Claire Cormier. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-07-0521JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by US Environmental Protection Agency. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-0922CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that at the parties' request, and good cause having been shown, the case management conference scheduled for July 12, 2018 is continued to September 20, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-09-1123STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by US Environmental Protection Agency. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1224ORDER as modified by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 23 Stipulation continuing further case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-1125STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by US Environmental Protection Agency. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-1226ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 25 Stipulation continuing case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar