Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00241
Date Filed2018-02-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward submitted a FOIA request to the Administration for Children and Families for records concerning correspondence from a list of named individuals pertaining to a list of keywords. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5314437) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-012LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-01Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-084GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 8, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-225NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/8/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-127ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Peterson, Benton) Modified to add link on 3/13/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-12MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before April 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 12, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings due by 4/12/2018. (hs) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-04-028Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before April 12, 2018, regarding how the parties wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 5, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-129Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer on or before April 30, 2018, to discuss the results of the Office of the Secretary search and any information the Administration for Children and Families has provided regarding the source of the large file sizes and other issues that may help focus the scope of the request. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before May 10, 2018, regarding how the parties wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 17, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 4/30/2018. Status Report due by 5/10/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on May 22, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED that agency counsel shall attend the hearing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 14, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-18MINUTE ORDER. Due to a change in the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for May 22, 2018, is CONTINUED to May 23, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 18, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 5/23/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2311ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral rulings issued at the status conference held on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall make an aggressive effort to work with the plaintiff to assess what actions need to be taken with regard to the three searches in this matter in order to submit a concrete production proposal regarding the FOIA request at issue in this case. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 31, 2018, at 9:30 a.m., in order to propose a production schedule to the Court. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 23, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 5/23/2018. Parties advise the court of the status of this action. Next status conference set for 7/31/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint Loth.) (tj) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-07-3112ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral rulings issued at the status conference held on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall continue to process 1,500 pages per month and produce to the plaintiff any responsive records on a rolling basis. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on September 27, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 31, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 7/31/2018. Status Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-09-27Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 9/27/2018. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (hs) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-28MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral ruling issued at the status conference held on September 27, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 28, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-11-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 16, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2019 (hs) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2019 (hs) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2019-01-1514MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 14 Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the government seeks to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 16, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-2215Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the continued lapse in appropriations, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for filing a joint status report on January 28, 2019, previously imposed by this Court is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that once appropriations have been restored, the parties shall forthwith file a joint status report proposing new deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 23, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-2816Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 1, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0617Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-0518NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-04-0819Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 7, 2019, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 9, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-06-0720Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 7, 2019, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019 (hs) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-08-0721Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-09MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 7, 2019, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 9, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2019 (zs) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-10-0722Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional status report on or before November 6, 2019, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 9, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2019 (hs) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-1723NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of EQUITY FORWARD (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-2224NOTICE of Appearance by Christine H. Monahan on behalf of EQUITY FORWARD (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-2325NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to EQUITY FORWARD. Attorney Cerissa Cafasso terminated. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-11-0626Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before January 7, 2020, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 12, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2020 (hs) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar